ME LD1026 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Secretary of State To Examine Best Practices in Elections
Title
Resolve, Directing the Secretary of State To Examine Best Practices in Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-278). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-278) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |