ME LD1083 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 371 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement Ranked-choice Voting for Presidential Primary and General Elections in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement Ranked-choice Voting for Presidential Primary and General Elections in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Enactment RC #371 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #303 (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #327 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 371 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2019-08-26SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-08-26SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-20SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2019-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-313).
2019-06-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-313) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-19HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 303 (Yeas 86 - Nays 59 - Absent 5 - Excused 1)
2019-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-19HouseReports READ.
2019-06-18SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-18SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-313)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-313) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-18SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-18SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 327 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-313) ACCEPTED
2019-06-18SenateReports READ
2019-03-05HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-03-05SenateCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback