ME LD1156 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create the Savings Account Program for Small Businesses
Title
An Act To Create the Savings Account Program for Small Businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Chipman of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1156&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0845&item=1&snum=129 |