ME LD1164 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Improve the Educational Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-229). |
2019-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-229) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-229) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently Report Accepted |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION |
2019-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed |