ME LD1177 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Public Sector Labor Relations
Title
An Act To Improve Public Sector Labor Relations
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] |
Rep. Roland Martin [D] | Rep. David McCrea [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #358 (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #306 (Y: 80 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #335 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #306 (Y: 80 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #335 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | LD 1177 In Senate, June 20, 2019, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 17 and 15, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | RELEASED. |
2019-06-19 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle. |
2019-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-308). |
2019-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-308) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 306 (Yeas 80 - Nays 67 - Absent 3 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-308) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-308) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 335 Yeas 19 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 1 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |