ME LD1190 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Furnishing of Tobacco Products to Minors
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Furnishing of Tobacco Products to Minors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238). |
2019-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-238) Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot moved to Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |