ME LD1208 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the 1998 Special Retirement Plan To Include Detectives in the Office of the Attorney General
Title
An Act To Expand the 1998 Special Retirement Plan To Include Detectives in the Office of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Donna Doore [D] |
Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #243 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-498) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-498) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 243 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-498). |
2019-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-498) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |