ME LD1227 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Parents To Apply to the Commissioner of Education To Enroll Their Children in a Receiving School Administrative Unit and To Remove Limitations on Which Students May Be So Enrolled
Title
An Act To Allow Parents To Apply to the Commissioner of Education To Enroll Their Children in a Receiving School Administrative Unit and To Remove Limitations on Which Students May Be So Enrolled
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] |
Rep. Abigail Griffin [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #182 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #165 (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #165 (Y: 93 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 182 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 165 (Yeas 93 - Nays 48 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |