ME LD1231 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund Energy Efficiency Programs through a Fee on the Sale of Unregulated Heating Fuels
Title
An Act To Fund Energy Efficiency Programs through a Fee on the Sale of Unregulated Heating Fuels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #274 (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 274 (Yeas 133 - Nays 13 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lawrence of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed. |