ME LD1270 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Certain Recreational Opportunities on State-owned Land
Title
An Act To Create Certain Recreational Opportunities on State-owned Land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2020-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senator DILL of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1270&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0390&item=1&snum=129 |