ME LD1282 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Green New Deal for Maine
Title
An Act To Establish a Green New Deal for Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #246 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #182 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #182 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-460) thereto in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-460) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York House Amendment "A" (H-460) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) READ |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 246 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report in Concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-460) thereto. |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-460) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative MAXMIN of Nobleboro, House Amendment "A" (H-460) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-413) was READ. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 182 (Yeas 84 - Nays 55 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-05 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-06-03 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-06-03 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |