ME LD13 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Microgrids That Are in the Public Interest
Title
An Act To Allow Microgrids That Are in the Public Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #368 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-742). |
2020-03-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-742) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-03-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 368 (Yeas 85 - Nays 54 - Absent 10 - Excused 1) - Vacant 1 |
2020-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-01-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-01-02 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |