ME LD1364 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Net Neutrality and Internet Policy
Title
An Act Regarding Net Neutrality and Internet Policy
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Christopher Caiazzo [D] |
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Adopt Hah-342 To Cah-301 RC #140 (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-257) thereto. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-257) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-257) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Senate Amendment "C" (S-257) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) READ |
2019-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-342) thereto. |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-342) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 140 (Yeas 92 - Nays 49 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative GROHOSKI of Ellsworth, House Amendment "A" (H-342) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-301) was READ. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |