ME LD139 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address the Unmet Workforce Needs of Employers and To Improve the Economic Future of Workers
Title
An Act To Address the Unmet Workforce Needs of Employers and To Improve the Economic Future of Workers
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] |
Rep. James Handy [D] | Rep. Norman Higgins [I] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-82), in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-82) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-82). |
2019-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |