ME LD1415 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Laws Regarding Abandoned Roads
Title
An Act To Improve the Laws Regarding Abandoned Roads
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. John Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-691), in concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-691) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-691). |
2020-02-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |