ME LD1430 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create Tax Equity among Renewable Energy Investments
Title
An Act To Create Tax Equity among Renewable Energy Investments
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Sen. Russell Black [R] |
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-507), in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-507) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-507). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |