ME LD1447 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Simplify Voting in Maine by Placing a Moratorium on Ranked-choice Voting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Simplify Voting in Maine by Placing a Moratorium on Ranked-choice Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #107 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #95 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2019-05-21SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-05-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-16SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-16SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report,
2019-05-16SenateSenator LUCHINI of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
2019-05-16SenateReports READ
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 95 (Yeas 86 - Nays 53 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-14HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback