ME LD149 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Provide Student Debt Forgiveness To Support Workforce Attraction and Retention
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Provide Student Debt Forgiveness To Support Workforce Attraction and Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | Subsequently, The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Refer to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo The Majority REFER to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Report ACCEPTED in concurrence AND The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=149&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0036&item=1&snum=129 |