ME LD1519 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning the Establishment of Benefit Corporations
Title
An Act Concerning the Establishment of Benefit Corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |