ME LD1529 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Nondisclosure Agreements in Employment
Title
An Act Concerning Nondisclosure Agreements in Employment
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] |
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #247 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Labor and Housing in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order HP 1112. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | On further motion of same Representative The Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1319) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 247 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-448). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |