ME LD1555 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Highway Maintenance Safety
Title
An Act To Improve Highway Maintenance Safety
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Thomas Martin [R] |
Rep. Andrew McLean [D] | Rep. Michael Perkins [R] | Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-206). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-206). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-206) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |