ME LD1578 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Administration of the Maine Aeronautical Advisory Board and the Public Transit Advisory Council
Title
An Act To Improve Administration of the Maine Aeronautical Advisory Board and the Public Transit Advisory Council
Sponsors
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |