ME LD1655 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Conform to the United States Internal Revenue Code of 1986 and Provide Tax Relief to Maine Families
Title
An Act To Conform to the United States Internal Revenue Code of 1986 and Provide Tax Relief to Maine Families
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Dow [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - Table Until Later RC #691 (Y: 67 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2018-08-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-08-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-08-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-08-30 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-08-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-07-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-26 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 691 (Yeas 67 - Nays 54 - Absent 30 - Excused 0) |
2018-06-26 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2018-06-20 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) was READ. |
2018-06-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-06-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) thereto |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) ADOPTED |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln Senate Amendment "A" (S-496) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) READ |
2018-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-477) Report ACCEPTED |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senator DOW of Lincoln moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 27, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |