ME LD1662 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Save Lives by Establishing the Low Barrier Opioid Treatment Response Pilot Project within the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, To Save Lives by Establishing the Low Barrier Opioid Treatment Response Pilot Project within the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-05 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-03-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-398). |
2020-03-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-398) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-398) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |