ME LD167 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Food Shaming in Maine's Public Schools
Title
An Act To Prevent Food Shaming in Maine's Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. in concurrence |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending RECONSIDERATION |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to RECONSIDER whereby the Bill FAILED ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-04-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. FAILED |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-91), in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-91) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-91). |
2019-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |