ME LD1671 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Maine Capital Investment Credit To Ensure Fairness for Maine Businesses and To Reduce Taxes on Lower-income Working Families

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Maine Capital Investment Credit To Ensure Fairness for Maine Businesses and To Reduce Taxes on Lower-income Working Families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-20SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-18HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-18SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-18SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-623), in concurrence.
2019-06-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-623) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-18SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-18HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-623).
2019-06-18HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-18HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-07SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-05-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-05-02HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback