ME LD170 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Questions Regarding Criminal History on Certain State Employment Applications
Title
An Act To Prohibit Questions Regarding Criminal History on Certain State Employment Applications
Sponsors
Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - Acc Ought To Pass Rep RC #12 (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-03-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-03-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 12 (Yeas 94 - Nays 37 - Absent 18 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-03-14 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-14 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative STETKIS of Canaan REMOVED. |
2019-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |