ME LD1738 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Permit the Sale and Consumption of Alcohol in an Area That Is Not Contiguous to Licensed Premises
Title
An Act To Permit the Sale and Consumption of Alcohol in an Area That Is Not Contiguous to Licensed Premises
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] |
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Martin Grohman [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-354). |
2018-02-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-354) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-354) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |