ME LD1756 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Public Safety through Coordinated Reentry of Prisoners into the Community
Title
An Act To Improve Public Safety through Coordinated Reentry of Prisoners into the Community
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety in concurrence |
2020-02-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-20 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-02-20 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2020-02-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-02-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending the motion to SUSPEND THE RULES. |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland MOVED that the RULES BE SUSPENDED for the purpose of reconsideration. |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1427) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-580), in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-580) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-580). |
2019-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |