ME LD176 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance Participation on the State Board of Education
Title
An Act To Enhance Participation on the State Board of Education
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Dodge [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] | Rep. Norman Higgins [I] |
Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] | Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-29), in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-29) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-29). |
2019-03-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-03-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |