ME LD1779 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Standards for Operation and Maintenance and Asset Management for Publicly Owned Treatment Works and Municipal Satellite Collection Systems
Title
An Act To Establish Standards for Operation and Maintenance and Asset Management for Publicly Owned Treatment Works and Municipal Satellite Collection Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-677), in concurrence. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-677) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-677). |
2020-02-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |