ME LD1783 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] |
Rep. Thomas Martin [R] | Rep. Michael Perkins [R] | Rep. Bettyann Sheats [D] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-588), in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-588) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-588). |
2019-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |