ME LD1784 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Land Permit by Rule Application Fees
Title
An Act To Increase Land Permit by Rule Application Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Lydia Blume [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-542) thereto in concurrence |
2019-06-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-542) thereto. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-542) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | On further motion of same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-542) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the House RECEDED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-502), in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-502) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-502). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |