ME LD1874 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Subminimum Wage
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Subminimum Wage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #363 (Y: 120 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-724) in concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-724) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-724). |
2020-03-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-724) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-03-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 363 (Yeas 120 - Nays 18 - Absent 11 - Excused 1) - Vacant 1 |
2020-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-12-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2019-12-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019. |