ME LD204 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding for a Ranger Pilot Position in the Maine Forest Service
Title
An Act To Provide Funding for a Ranger Pilot Position in the Maine Forest Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #47 (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-66) in concurrence |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-66) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-66). |
2019-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-66) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 47 (Yeas 97 - Nays 42 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |