ME LD232 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Progressive Treatment Program and Processes by Which a Person May Be Involuntarily Admitted to a Psychiatric Hospital or Receive Court-ordered Community Treatment
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Progressive Treatment Program and Processes by Which a Person May Be Involuntarily Admitted to a Psychiatric Hospital or Receive Court-ordered Community Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-17 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-707), in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707). |
2020-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |