ME LD235 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Funding To Contain and Manage the Spread of Invasive Aquatic Species
Title
An Act To Increase Funding To Contain and Manage the Spread of Invasive Aquatic Species
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Riseman [I] | Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-309), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-309) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-309). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2019-01-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |