ME LD247 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Amount of Time School Counselors and Social Workers Spend Providing Students Direct and Indirect Counseling
Title
An Act To Increase the Amount of Time School Counselors and Social Workers Spend Providing Students Direct and Indirect Counseling
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] |
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-04 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-04 | House | In concurrence. |
2019-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-29). |
2019-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-29). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-29) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |