ME LD248 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Handling Fee for Beverage Containers Reimbursed to Redemption Centers
Title
An Act To Increase the Handling Fee for Beverage Containers Reimbursed to Redemption Centers
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Sen. Robert Foley [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto. |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) was READ. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-02 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-02 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-30 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-04-30 | House | Representative TUCKER of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator FOLEY of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-56) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-20) READ |
2019-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senator CARSON of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |