ME LD255 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require That Signatures on a Direct Initiative of Legislation Come from Each Congressional District
Title
Resolution, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require That Signatures on a Direct Initiative of Legislation Come from Each Congressional District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Recede And Concur - Emer RC #295 (Y: 77 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Final Passage-conres 2/3 Vote RC #323 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Final Passage - Con Res RC #250 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #261 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Final Passage-conres 2/3 Vote RC #323 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Final Passage - Con Res RC #250 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #261 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To FINALLY PASSED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House INSISTED on FAILING OF FINAL PASSAGE. |
2019-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 295 (Yeas 77 - Nays 64 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-18 | House | RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 323 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 250 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-13 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken. |
2019-06-13 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2019-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-247). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-247) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-247) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-247) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 261 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |