ME LD259 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the State To Meet the Mandatory 55 Percent Contribution to Schools
Title
An Act To Require the State To Meet the Mandatory 55 Percent Contribution to Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #125 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-28 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-28 | House | Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-130) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-130) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 125 Yeas 34 - Nays 1 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-01-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |