ME LD29 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Conform the Maine Apprenticeship Program to the Federal Equal Employment Opportunity Act of 1972
Title
An Act To Conform the Maine Apprenticeship Program to the Federal Equal Employment Opportunity Act of 1972
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - Enactment RC #47 (Y: 87 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #133 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #133 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 47 (Yeas 87 - Nays 60 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-48). |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-48) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 133 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-04-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-03-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |