ME LD300 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide School Personnel Paid Hourly a Wage Pay Option

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide School Personnel Paid Hourly a Wage Pay Option

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Recede And Concur RC #115 (Y: 72 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #84 (Y: 74 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-23HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 115 (Yeas 72 - Nays 60 - Absent 16 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-23HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-220) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-131) thereto.
2019-05-21SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-220) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-131) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-220) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-131) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-05-21SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-131) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-220) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-05-21SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-220) was ADOPTED
2019-05-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-220)
2019-05-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-16HouseIn accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
2019-05-16HouseFAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-220) in concurrence
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-220) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-14SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-14SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14SenateReports Read
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-220).
2019-05-09HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-09HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-220) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-09HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 84 (Yeas 74 - Nays 66 - Absent 9 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-09HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-09HouseReports READ.
2019-01-24SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-01-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-01-22HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback