ME LD333 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Dangerous Dogs and Nuisance Dogs To Allow for Flexibility in Protection Dog Training
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Dangerous Dogs and Nuisance Dogs To Allow for Flexibility in Protection Dog Training
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Scott Landry [D] |
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-04-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |