ME LD362 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Submit a State Plan Amendment To Exempt Retirement and Educational Assets from Calculations for Medicaid Eligibility
Title
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Submit a State Plan Amendment To Exempt Retirement and Educational Assets from Calculations for Medicaid Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2020-02-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-02-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-20 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-387). |
2020-02-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-387) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |