ME LD366 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Elderly Persons from Financial Abuse
Title
An Act To Protect Elderly Persons from Financial Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=366&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0107&item=1&snum=129 |