ME LD368 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Redefine Geographic Association for Multiple-employer Welfare Arrangements
Title
An Act To Redefine Geographic Association for Multiple-employer Welfare Arrangements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-49). |
2019-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-49). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-49) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-01-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |