ME LD373 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide MaineCare Coverage for Dental Services to Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, Brain Injuries and Other Related Conditions
Title
An Act To Provide MaineCare Coverage for Dental Services to Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, Brain Injuries and Other Related Conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-353), in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-353) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-353). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |