ME LD392 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund Maine's School-based Health Centers
Title
An Act To Fund Maine's School-based Health Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) in concurrence |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-156). |
2019-04-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-156) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-30 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |