ME LD428 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Wage and Employment Parity between Adult and Child Protective Services Caseworkers in the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
An Act To Establish Wage and Employment Parity between Adult and Child Protective Services Caseworkers in the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #233 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #203 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2019-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #203 (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-549) thereto in concurrence |
2019-06-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-549) thereto. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-549) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-549) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-139). |
2019-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative MADIGAN of Waterville, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-139). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 233 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-139). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-139) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 203 (Yeas 53 - Nays 76 - Absent 19 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-06 | House | Subsequently, Motion of Representative HYMANSON of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2019-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |